MO SJR14 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SJR 14-Schaefer, et al, with HA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SJR 14-Schaefer, et al, with HA 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies constitutional provisions regarding the right to keep and bear arms
Title
Modifies constitutional provisions regarding the right to keep and bear arms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SJR 14-Schaefer, et al, with HA 1 |
2013-05-17 | House | Motion S request H recede & take up and pass bill withdrawn |
2013-05-17 | House | Motion to concur in HA 1 withdrawn |
2013-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2013-05-17 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(1027S03.06H) |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-03-26 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Joint Resolution Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-03-26 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & defeated (Chappelle-Nadal)--(1027S03.01S) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Joint Resolution Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-03-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee - (1027S.03C) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 14-Schaefer, et al |