MS HB1096 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Certified Interior Designer Act; To Define Certain Terms; To Provide That The Mississippi Certified Interior Designers Shall Be Under The Mississippi Board Of Architecture; To Provide For Qualifications Of Applicants; To Provide For Examination Of Applicants; To Require Continuing Education; To Provide For The Biennial Renewal Of Certificates; To Require Fees; To Provide For The Regulation Of Conduct Of Interior Designers; To Require The Posting Of Certificates; To Provide For The Interior Design Advisory Committee (idac) And Prescribe Its Duties And Powers; To Provide For The Deposit Of Funds; To Provide Compensation For Members Of The Interior Design Advisory Committee; To Provide For Disciplinary Procedures; To Provide For Appeals; To Prohibit Certain Actions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Certified Interior Designer Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Willie Bailey [D] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] | Rep. Sherra Hillman Lane [D] | Rep. Diane Peranich [D] |
Rep. Jessica Upshaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-02 | Passed | |
2011-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-11 | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions | |
2011-02-10 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-02-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Judiciary B |