MS HB1284 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-19-99 And 27-19-155, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Of The Motor Vehicle Registration And Tag Fees Received By The Department Of Revenue, The Portion Of The Receipts Equal To The Cost Of License Tags, Decals And Associated Freight Costs Shall Be Deposited Into The Department Of Revenue License Tag Acquisition Fund; To Amend Section 27-19-179, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Monies In The Department Of Revenue License Tag Acquisition Fund May Be Used By The Department Of Revenue For The Purpose Of Paying The Costs Incurred For Purchasing License Tags And Decals And Associated Freight Costs; To Provide That All Unexpended Amounts Remaining In The Fund Above The Sum Of $500,000.00 At The End Of Each Fiscal Year Shall Lapse Into The State General Fund; To Amend Section 27-104-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Requirement That The Department Of Revenue License Tag Formations Be Funded By Appropriation Of The Legislature From The State General Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Revenue License Tag Acquisition Fund; revise certain provisions regarding.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2021-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 19 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 19 | 179 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 19 | 99 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |