MS HB1343 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-3-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "platoon" For The Purposes Of Certain Motor Vehicle Laws; To Amend Section 63-3-619, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Certain Vehicle Operators In A Platoon From Provisions Of Law Requiring Certain Distances To Be Maintained Between Traveling Vehicles; To Require Plans For The Operation Of A Platoon To Be Filed With The Department Of Transportation; To Provide That The Plans Are Accepted Or Rejected By The Department Of Transportation And Department Of Public Safety Within 30 Days Of Filing; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Platoon; define and exempt certain operators in from traveling distance requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Michel,Moran |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Busby,Wilson,Burnett |
2018-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2018-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-07 | House | Amended |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Transportation |