MS HB1427 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Mayor And Board Of Aldermen Of The City Of Brandon, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Sale Of Prepared Food And Beverages In Restaurants And Bars In An Amount Not To Exceed Two Percent Of Gross Proceeds For The Purpose Of Promoting Tourism, Parks And Recreation; To Require The Tax, Before Its Imposition, Be Approved By Sixty Percent Of Qualified Electors Voting In A Referendum On The Question Of Levying The Tax; To Require The Tax Be Collected By The Department Of Revenue And Paid To The City Of Brandon; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Brandon; authorize a tax on sales of prepared food and drink at restaurants and bars.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Andy Gipson [R] | Rep. Bennett Malone [D] | Rep. Kevin McGee [R] |
Rep. John Moore [R] | Rep. Ray Rogers [R] | Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] | Rep. Adrienne Wooten [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 100 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-29 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-29 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-28 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-28 | Amended | |
2011-03-28 | Reconsidered | |
2011-03-28 | Recalled From House | |
2011-03-28 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2011-03-28 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-28 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-28 | Amended | |
2011-03-27 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-03-27 | DR - TSDPAA: LP To FI | |
2011-03-27 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance | |
2011-03-27 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-26 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-26 | Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-03-25 | DR - TSDPCS: WM To LP | |
2011-03-24 | DR - TSDPCS: LP To WM | |
2011-01-27 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation;Ways and Means |