MS HB1488 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $11,000,000.00 For The Ace Fund; To Amend Section 57-61-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $4,000,000.00 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act; To Amend Section 57-61-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Amount Of Bond Proceeds That The Mississippi Development Authority May Utilize Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act To Make Grants Or Loans To Counties And Municipalities Through An Equipment And Public Facilities Grant And Loan Fund To Aid In Infrastructure-related Improvements, The Purchase Of Equipment And In The Purchase, Construction Or Repair And Renovation Of Public Facilities; To Amend Section 57-75-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase From $68,000,000.00 To $71,000,000.00 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Act For Projects Designed To Enhance Facilities That Are At Risk For Closure Pursuant To The Base Closure And Realignment Act Of 1991 Or Other Applicable Federal Law; To Extend The Reverter On The Provisions That Authorize The State Bond Commission To Negotiate The Sale Of Bonds Issued Under The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Act; To Authorize The Issuance Of $2,000,000.00 Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For The Mississippi Site Development Grant Fund; To Amend Section 57-1-701, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Portion Of The Proceeds Of Certain Bonds May Be Used By The Mississippi Development Authority To Reimburse Certain Costs Related To The Administration Of The Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance for various Mississippi Development Authority programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2018-02-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed |
2018-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |