MS HB1524 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Lee County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Sanctuary Hospice House; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Lee County; authorize contribution to the Sanctuary Hospice House.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-15 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-15 | Passed | |
2011-03-14 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-14 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2011-03-14 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-11 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-11 | Passed | |
2011-03-11 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-09 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |