MS HB1627 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 955, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2014, To July 1, 2017, On The Law That Authorizes The City Of Southaven, Mississippi, To Impose A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of The Sales Of Beverages And Prepared Food At Restaurants Within The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Southaven; extend date of repeal on restaurant tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Wanda Jennings [R] | Rep. W Alday [R] | Rep. Frank Hamilton [R] | Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] |
Rep. Pat Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/history/HB/HB1627.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2014/html/HB/1600-1699/HB1627IN.htm |