MS HB1659 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of New Albany, Mississippi, To Extend Its Natural Gas Distribution System To All Areas Of Union County, Mississippi, Not Certificated To Or Otherwise Served By Any Other Natural Gas Utility And To Certain Areas Of Marshall County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of New Albany; authorize to extend its natural gas distribution system to certain areas of Union and Marshall Counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2015-03-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-03-16 | House | Passed |
2015-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |