MS HB1693 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Warren County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To We Care Communities, Inc.; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Warren County; authorize contribution to We Care Communities, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2018-03-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-20 | House | Passed |
2018-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |