MS HB1758 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Boards Of Supervisors Of Alcorn, Benton, Marshall, Prentiss, Tippah And Tishomingo Counties To Contribute To Northeast Mississippi Community Services, Inc., In An Amount Determined By Each Individual Board Not To Exceed $150,000.00 To Be Used As Matching Funds From The State Or Federal Government; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcorn, Benton, Marshall, Prentiss, Tippah, Tishomingo Counties; authorize contribution to Northest MS Community Services, Inc.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. Donnie Bell [R] | Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] | Rep. John Faulkner [D] |
Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] | Rep. Steve Massengill [R] | Rep. Jody Steverson [R] | Rep. Jerry Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2016-04-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |