MS HB1789 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The State Soil And Water Conservation Commission For The Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Soil and Water Conservation Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Brent Anderson [R] | Rep. Bryant Clark [D] |
Rep. Casey Eure [R] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] | Rep. Lataisha Jackson [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] |
Rep. Bill Pigott [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | House | Died In Conference |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,McCaughn,Tate |
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Bounds,Read,Mangold |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To A1 |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: A1 To AP |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations B;Appropriations A |