MS HB1802 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation From Special Funds In The State Treasury For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi State Board Of Nursing Home Administrators For The Fiscal Year 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Nursing Home Administrators, Board of.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Deweese [R] | Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Sam Creekmore [R] |
Rep. Becky Currie [R] | Rep. Missy Warren McGee [R] | Rep. Omeria Scott [D] | Rep. Jerry Turner [R] |
Rep. Charles Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | House | Died In Conference |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Parker,McLendon |
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Deweese,Read,Currie |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed |
2024-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To A2 |
2024-03-13 | House | DR - TSDP: A2 To AP |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Appropriations C;Appropriations A |