MS HB1916 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The State Department Of Health For The Purpose Of Providing Grants To Eleven Hospitals That Were Ineligible For Grants From The Mississippi Hospital Sustainability Grant Program For The Period Beginning Upon The Passage Of This Act And Ending June 30, 2025.
Title
Appropriation; Health Department for grants to hospitals ineligible for grants from Hospital Sustainability Grant Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Mims [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | House | Died In Conference |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Blackwell,Polk |
2024-04-18 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Read,Oliver |
2024-04-18 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations A |