MS HB352 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 73-60-47, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Applicants For Licensure As A Home Inspector To Undergo Certain Background Checks; To Amend Sections 73-60-11 And 73-60-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Home inspector license; require applicants to undergo certain background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2021-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 60 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 60 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |