MS HB461 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-4-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Provision That Authorizes The State Board Of Mental Health To Supervise, Coordinate And Establish Standards For All Operations And Activities Of The State Related To Mental Health And Providing Mental Health Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mental Health; extend repealer on operational standards and state board's authority over regional centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-06 | House | Passed |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendment Ruled Improper |
2017-02-01 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2017-02-01 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2017-01-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |