MS HB48 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Uniform Depositions And Discovery Act; To Enact Definitions; To Provide For Interstate Issuance Of Subpoenae; To Provide For Service Of Subpoenae; To Provide For Application Of The Rules Of Civil Procedure To Subpoenae Issued Under The Act; To Provide For Application To Enforce, Quash Or Modify; To Provide For Effectiveness In Pending Proceedings; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Uniform laws; enact Uniform Interstate Deposition and Discovery Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Allow Governor's Veto to Stand | |
2011-03-31 | Veto Referred To Judiciary A | |
2011-03-30 | Vetoed | |
2011-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-10 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2011-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-02-22 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A | |
2011-02-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-01-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Judiciary A |