MS HB575 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 89-1-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Payment Of A Fee To A Person Imposing Certain Covenants On Future Conveyances Of Real Property; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fee for future conveyance of property; prohibit payment of certain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-02 | Passed | |
2011-02-22 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-27 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A | |
2011-01-26 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-25 | Passed | |
2011-01-19 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | Referred To Judiciary A |