MS HB708 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-27-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Human Services To Make Alternative Uses Of Columbia Training School Properties And Facilities; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Columbia Training School properties; authorize alternative uses by Department of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2010-02-17 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-11 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-10 | Read the Third Time | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-02-02 | DR - TSDPCS: PP To JJ | |
2010-01-27 | DR - TSDPCS: JJ To PP | |
2010-01-13 | Referred To Juvenile Justice;Public Property |