MS HB708 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-19-56.22, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Distribution Of Fees Collected From Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags Issued To Members Of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Distinctive motor vehicle license tag; revise distribution of fees collected from issuance to members of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity.
Sponsors
Rep. Willie Perkins [D] | Rep. Gregory Holloway [D] | Rep. David Myers [D] | Rep. Orlando Paden [D] |
Rep. Abe Hudson [D] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2017-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed |
2017-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Revenue and Expenditure General Bills |