MS HB764 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Conference Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 41-3-1.1, 41-3-3, 41-3-4, 41-3-5.1, 41-3-6, 41-3-15, 41-3-16, 41-3-17, 41-3-18 And 41-3-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The State Board Of Health, Establish The Position Of Executive Officer Of The State Department Of Health, And Establish And Prescribe The Powers And Duties Of The State Department Of Health; To Amend Section 41-3-20, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Those Reenacted Statutes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Department of Health and State Board of Health; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Shanks [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-28 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2024-04-28 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2024-04-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,Blount,DeBar |
2024-04-11 | House | Conferees Named Creekmore IV,Felsher,McLean |
2024-04-10 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2024-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |