MS HB80 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 13-1-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create An Evidentiary Presumption Of Death To Be Known As The "zeb Hughes Law" Whenever Uncontradicted Sworn Testimony And Evidence Support A Determination Of The Death Of A Missing Person Who Has Undergone A Catastrophic Event That Exposed The Person To Imminent Peril; To Create New Section 41-57-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The State Registrar Of Vital Statistics To Prepare A Death Certificate For A Missing Person Legally Presumed To Be Dead Upon Receipt Of A Proper Court Order; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Presumption of death; create for missing persons who have undergone a catastrophic event causing imminent peril.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2024-02-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed |
2024-02-08 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |