MS HB853 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-1037, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Boundaries Of The Congressional Districts To Conform To The 2000 Census Data; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Congressional districts; conform to 2000 census.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Died In Conference | |
2011-03-29 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2011-03-29 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-15 | Conferees Named Burton,Flowers,Dickerson | |
2011-03-08 | Conferees Named Reynolds,Blackmon,Peranich | |
2011-03-07 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-01-27 | Referred To Elections | |
2011-01-27 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-25 | Passed | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-20 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |