MS HB911 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Encourage The State Board Of Education To Establish The Mississippi Senior Cadets Program; To Provide That The Purpose Of The Program Is To Reduce Poor Academic Scores And High Drop-out Rates Throughout The State; To Authorize The State Department Of Education To Create Rules And Regulations To Administer The Program; To Establish Minimum Guidelines For Students Who Participate In The Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Senior Cadets Program; establish in State Department of Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Clara Burnett [D] | Rep. Henry Espy [D] | Rep. Karl Gibbs [D] | Rep. Esther Harrison [D] |
Rep. Robert Huddleston [D] | Rep. America Middleton [D] | Rep. Omeria Scott [D] | Rep. Sara Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Referred To Education | |
2011-02-14 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Passed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Education |