MS HC83 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Life And Legacy Of Mr. Willie Flynt Lee, And Expressing Gratitude For His Public Service.
Title
Willie Flynt Lee; commend the life of.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Gipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Died In Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-11 | Adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-05 | Referred To Rules |