MS HC9 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Proposing An Amendment To Section 201 Of The Mississippi Constitution Of 1890, Offered By The Mississippi Legislature As An Alternative To Initiative Measure No. 42, To Require The Legislature To Provide, By General Law, For The Establishment, Maintenance And Support Of An Effective System Of Free Public Schools; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Constitution; legislative alternative to Initiative No. 42 regarding public schools funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-13 - House - House Adopted (Y: 64 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2015-01-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-01-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-01-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (66th), DeLano, White, Holland) |
2015-01-13 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred To Constitution |