MS HR100 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Coldwater High School Cougars Boys Basketball Team And Head Coach Wert Spiva, Jr., For Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 1a State Championship.
Title
Coldwater High School Boys Basketball Team; commend upon winning class 1A State Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Immediate Release | |
2012-05-01 | Adopted | |
2012-04-30 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-27 | Referred To Rules |