MS HR128 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Essie B. And William Earl Glenn Foundation For Its Impressive Humanitarian Efforts, Congratulating The Organization On The Occasion Of Its Fifth Statewide Symposium And Encouraging The Citizens Of Mississippi To Observe April 18, 2024, As Adverse Childhood Experiences (aces) Trauma Awareness Day.
Title
The Essie B. and William Earl Glenn Foundation; commend on occasion of its fifth symposium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-16 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred To Rules |