MS HR4 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Long Beach High School Bearcats Girls Volleyball Team For Winning The 2010 Mississippi High School Activities Association Class Ii State Championship.
Title
Long Beach High School Bearcats Girls Volleyball Team; commend and congratulate upon winning MHSAA Class II State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-11 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-11 | Adopted | |
2011-01-10 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Rules |