MS HR5 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Mr. Max Jordan On Celebrating The Most Auspicious Occasion Of The 100th Anniversary Of His Birth On January 10, 2013.
Title
Mr. Max Jordan; commend and congratulate on the occasion of his 100th birthday.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Zuber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-01-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred To Rules |