MS HR82 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Brooke O'hair, Head Coach For The Mississippi College Lady Choctaws Softball Team, Upon The Milestone Of Capturing Her 500th Career Softball Coaching Win.
Title
Brooke O'Hair; commend and congratulate upon 500th career head coaching win.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred To Rules |