MS HR86 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating World War Ii Veteran, Leroy Worsham, Of Corinth, Mississippi, Upon Being Selected By Honor Flight To Visit The World War Ii Memorial In Washington, D.c.
Title
Leroy Worsham; congratulate upon earning trip to Washington D.C. with fellow World War II Veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-20 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-20 | Adopted | |
2012-04-13 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-11 | Referred To Rules |