MS SB2030 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That Any Candidate For A Municipal, County Or County District Office Shall Be A Resident Of The Municipality, County Or County District That He Or She Seeks To Represent For Two Years Immediately Preceding The Election Day; To Provide An Exemption From The Residency Requirement For Candidates From Municipalities With A Certain Population; To Amend Sections 65-1-3 And 25-31-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Candidate For The Offices Of Transportation Commissioner And District Attorney Shall Be A Resident Of The State District That He Or She Seeks To Represent For Five Years Immediately Preceding The Election Day; To Amend Section 69-1-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Candidate For The Office Of Commissioner Of Agriculture And Commerce Shall Be A Resident Of The State For Five Years Immediately Preceding The Election Day; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Elections; impose residency requirement to run for certain offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 86 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 86 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Elections |