MS SB2311 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-153, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Compensation For County Election Commissioners Who Perform The Duties Of An Executive Committee With Regard To The Conduct Of A Primary Election Under A Written Agreement Entered Into With An Executive Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Election commissioners; authorize compensation if they conduct primary elections under an agreement with an executive committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-03-05 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To AE |
2013-02-28 | House | DR - TSDP: AE To AP |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections;Appropriations |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EL To AC |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |