MS SB2414 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 79-4-1.22, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Correct A Typographical Error Omitting Certain Fees To Be Charged By The Secretary Of State Concerning Business Corporations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Model Business Corporation Act; correct certain fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-05 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Passed | |
2010-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-02-03 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-21 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |