MS SB2511 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 29-3-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That The Local School Board Is Authorized To Reject Bids For Hunting And Fishing Rights On Sixteenth Section School Land And Hold An Auction Among Those Who Submitted Bids; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hunting rights on sixteenth section school land; local school board may hold an auction on leases for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-28 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2011-03-28 | Reconsidered | |
2011-03-28 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-22 | Conferees Named Brown,Holloway,Walley | |
2011-03-17 | Conferees Named Carmichael,Tollison,McDaniel | |
2011-03-14 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-08 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Education | |
2011-02-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-01-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Education |