MS SB2565 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Certain Segment Of U.s. Highway 61 In Bolivar County As The Henry Butler Memorial Highway; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highway; designate a certain segment of U.S. Highway 61 in Bolivar County as the "Henry Butler Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-28 | House | Conferees Named Johnson,Hines,Coleman (65th) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Hudson,Simmons (12th) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-03 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2015-02-26 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |