MS SB2578 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-35-157, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If Property Is Found To Have Escaped Ad Valorem Taxation Due To A County Board Of Supervisors Having Granted An Ad Valorem Tax Exemption Authorized By Law And Then Inadvertently Allowing The Exemption To Extend Beyond The Period Authorized By Law For The Exemption, A Taxpayer May Pay The Ad Valorem Taxes, Without Any Penalty Or Interest, Which Otherwise Would Have Been Levied On The Property Had It Not Been Inadvertently Exempted From Ad Valorem Taxation By The County Board Of Supervisors; To Bring Forward Section 27-35-155, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Assessment Of Property Having Escaped Ad Valorem Taxation, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Amend Section 27-33-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Qualified Homeowner Claiming A Homestead Exemption Allowed For A Person Who Is Sixty-five Years Of Age Or Older Or Totally Disabled Shall Be Allowed An Additional Exemption From All Ad Valorem Taxes On An Amount Equal To The Difference Between The Assessed Value Of The Homestead Property On January 1, 2018, Or January 1 Of The First Year For Which The Qualified Homeowner Claims An Exemption On The Property, And Any Increase In The Assessed Value Of The Homestead Property Resulting From An Update In Valuation Of The Homestead Property That Is Completed During The Time The Qualified Homeowner Owns The Property; To Provide That If A Subsequent Update In Valuation Of The Homestead Property That Is Completed During The Time The Qualified Homeowner Owns The Property Results In The Assessed Value Of The Homestead Property Being Less Than The Assessed Value Of The Property On January 1, 2018, Or January 1 Of The First Year For Which The Qualified Homeowner Claims Homestead Exemption For The Property, Then The Exemption Authorized Under This Act Shall Be On An Amount Equal To The Difference Between Such Lower Assessed Value And Any Increase In The Assessed Value Of The Homestead Property Resulting From A Subsequent Update In Valuation Of The Homestead Property That Is Completed During The Time The Qualified Homeowner Owns The Property; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; revise provisions regarding payment where county inadvertently exempted property, revise certain homestead exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Smith,Lamar,Carpenter |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Parks |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-28 | House | Amended |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Amended |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Finance |