MS SB2634 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Due From Governor 05/25/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Due From Governor 05/25/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 17-2-7 And 17-2-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Floodplain Management Ordinances Or Regulations Necessary For Eligibility For The National Flood Insurance Program Shall Apply Retroactively To Certain Construction Or Improvement Permits; And For Related Purposes.
Title
National Flood Insurance Program; revise laws regarding eligibility for.
Sponsors
Sen. Videt Carmichael [R] | Sen. Thomas Gollott [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] |
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Due From Governor 05/25/12 | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-27 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Chism,Buck (5th),Turner | |
2012-04-24 | Conferees Named Carmichael,Parks,Browning | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-13 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-12 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-12 | Amended | |
2012-04-12 | Reconsidered | |
2012-03-21 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Chism, Buck (5th)) | |
2012-03-21 | Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-14 | Referred To Insurance | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Insurance |