MS SB2652 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-5-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create As A Thirteenth Ground For Divorce The Bona Fide, Complete Separation Of The Parties For A Certain Period Of Time; To Enact Certain Restrictions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Divorce; create bona fide separation as the 13th ground.
Sponsors
Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Alice Harden [D] | Sen. John Horhn [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Kenneth Jones [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House Failed (Y: 39 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Failed | |
2011-02-17 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |