MS SB2703 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Due From Governor 05/25/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Due From Governor 05/25/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 51-9-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Names Submitted To The Governor By The Boards Of Supervisors Of Madison County And Rankin County For Appointment To The Pearl River Industrial Commission Shall Be The Names Of Persons Who Reside On And Are Holders Of Residential Leases From The Pearl River Valley Water Supply District That Are Located In Madison County And Rankin County, Respectively, Or Who Reside In Established Subdivisions In Madison County And Rankin County, Respectively, In Which Some Of The Residential Property Of The Subdivision Is Leased From The Pearl River Valley Water Supply District; To Provide That Each Member Of The Commission Shall Serve For A Term Concurrent With That Of The Governor; To Amend Section 51-9-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Additional Members Appointed To The Board Of Directors Of The Pearl River Valley Water Supply District By The Boards Of Supervisors Of Madison County And Rankin County Shall Be Persons Who Reside On And Are Holders Of Residential Leases From The District That Are Located In Madison County And Rankin County, Respectively, Or Who Reside In Established Subdivisions In Madison County And Rankin County, Respectively, In Which Some Of The Residential Property Of The Subdivision Is Leased From The Pearl River Valley Water Supply District; To Provide That Members Of The Board Of Directors Of The District Who Are Appointed By The Boards Of Supervisors Shall Serve For Terms Concurrent With The Terms Of The Members Of The Board Of Supervisors; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pearl River Valley Water Supply District; revise board appointments, powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 68 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House Failed (Y: 44 N: 72 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 68 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House Failed (Y: 44 N: 72 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Due From Governor 05/25/12 | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-04-30 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Calhoun, Beckett, McGee) | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2012-04-29 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-29 | Conference Report Filed | |
2012-04-26 | Conferees Named Beckett,McGee,Mettetal | |
2012-04-24 | Conferees Named Ward,Harkins,Tollison | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-17 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-11 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Reconsidered | |
2012-04-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (McGee, Beckett) | |
2012-04-04 | Failed | |
2012-03-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-22 | Referred To Public Utilities | |
2012-03-14 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-13 | Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2012-03-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-03-01 | DR - TSDPCS: WI To AP | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks;Appropriations |