MS SB2710 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Sections 37-151-15, 37-151-17, 37-151-19, 37-151-21 And 37-151-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Establish A Council For Education Technology, Prescribe Its Membership, Define Its Responsibilities And Create A State Public School Education Technology Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Council for Education Technology; repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-04 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-03 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2011-02-28 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Staples, Brown, Thomas) | |
2011-02-28 | Passed | |
2011-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Education | |
2011-02-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-01-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Education |