MS SB2792 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-28 - Conference Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-28 - Conference Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-7-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Waive The Adoption Filing Fee For Cases Involving The Department Of Child Protection Services; To Amend Section 93-15-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Summons To Be Issued And Served On A Child Who Is 12 Years Or Older In An Involuntary Termination Of Parental Rights Proceeding; To Provide That The Minor Child Shall Be Represented By Counsel Throughout The Proceedings; To Require The Court To Consider The Child's Preferences, If Any, If The Child Is 14 Years Or Older At The Time Of The Hearing; To Provide That The Style Of The Case Shall Not Include The Child's Name; To Require A Court To Hold A Hearing On The Petition Within A Certain Period Of Days; To Authorize The Court To Continue The Hearing Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 43-21-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require A Youth Court Judge To Appoint Counsel For An Indigent Custodial Parent Or Guardian Who Is A Party In An Abuse, Neglect Or Termination Of Parental Rights Proceeding; To Authorize A Youth Court Judge To Appoint Counsel For An Indigent Noncustodial Parent If The Youth Court Judge Determines That The Parent Has Demonstrated A Significant Custodial Relationship With The Child; To Clarify The Duty Of An Attorney Under The Section; To Provide That The Department Of Child Protection Services Shall Have The Right To Be Represented By Agency Counsel At All Stages Of The Proceedings Involving A Child For Whom The Department Has Custody Of; To Amend Section 43-21-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of "neglected Child" And "reasonable Efforts"; To Amend Section 43-21-151, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Jurisdiction Of The Youth Court Shall Attach At The Of The Offense, Or At The Time Of The Allegation Of Abuse, Neglect Or Exploitation; To Create A New Section Within Title 43, Chapter 21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Noncomprehensive List Of Reasons That Would Constitute Compelling And Extraordinary Reasons Why Termination Of Parental Rights Would Not Be In The Child’s Best Interests; To Create A New Section Within Title 93, Chapter 15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Noncomprehensive List Of Reasons That Would Constitute Compelling And Extraordinary Reasons Why Termination Of Parental Rights Would Not Be In The Child’s Best Interests; To Amend Section 43-21-613, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Timeline For And Frequency Of Permanency Hearings; To Amend Section 93-15-121, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify A Ground For The Termination Of A Parent's Parental Rights; To Amend Section 97-5-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Section To The Revised Definition Of "neglected Child"; To Define "torture" For The Purposes Of Felony Child Abuse; To Amend Section 43-21-651, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Right Of Appeal From Youth Court; To Amend Section 43-21-351, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Youth Court Intake Officers To Receive Training On Mycids; Require The Mississippi Judicial College, In Conjunction With The Administrative Office Of Courts, To Develop Training Materials On Mycids; To Amend Section 43-21-801, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Youth Court Judges To Receive At Least 1 Hour Of Annual Continuing Education Concerning Oversight Of Youth Court Intake Officers And Mycids; To Amend Sections 43-21-301, 43-21-303 And 93-17-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Bring Forward Section 43-21-121, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is The Provision That Provides For The Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litems, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 93-15-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is The Provision That Provide For The Termination Of Parental Rights By Written Voluntary Release, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Foster care and adoption; revise provisions related to per recommendations of task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Hood,Yates,Fondren |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Boyd,Turner-Ford |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-09 | House | Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 7 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 15 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 15 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 15 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
93 | 17 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 5 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |