MS SB2920 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 947, Local And Private Laws Of 1979, As Last Amended By Chapter 961, Local And Private Laws Of 1998, To Authorize The Madison County Economic Development Authority To Borrow $100,000,000.00 Secured By Execution Of A Deed Of Trust Or Lease Upon Any Property Owned Or Leased By The Authority, Or Other Collateral Available To Or In The Possession Of The Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Madison County; increase the amount of bonds that may be issued for the Madison County Economic Development Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 72 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-04-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Smith (39th), Rogers (61st), Warren, Blackmon) |
2013-03-30 | House | Passed |
2013-03-30 | House | Point of Order-Not Well Taken |
2013-03-30 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2013-03-30 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | House | DR - TSDP: LP To WM |
2013-03-28 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To LP |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred To Ways and Means;Local and Private Legislation |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-03-26 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: LP To FI |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |