MS SB3024 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The Mississippi Department Of Revenue, Including The Homestead Exemption Division, The Motor Vehicle Comptroller Functions, The Alcoholic Beverage Control Division, And The Bureau Of Telecommunications, For The Purpose Of Reimbursing The Counties, County Districts And Municipal Separate School Districts For Tax Losses Incurred By Reason Of The Exemption Of Homes From Certain Ad Valorem Taxes, And For The Purpose Of Purchasing Motor Vehicle License Tags For Fiscal Year 2020.
Title
Appropriation; Revenue, Department of.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Gary Jackson [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-28 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2019-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Bounds,Beckett |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Horhn,Tollison |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |