MS SB3075 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 932, Local And Private Laws Of 2015, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Board Of Supervisors Of Jackson County, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon Hotel And Motel Room Rentals In Jackson County And Provides That The Revenue From The Tax Shall Be Paid To The Mississippi Gulf Coast Regional Convention And Visitors Bureau To Be Used For The Promotion Of Tourism On The Mississippi Gulf Coast; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Jackson County; extend the repeal date on the county's hotel and motel tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |