MS SB3128 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Oxford, Mississippi, To Establish The City Of Oxford Municipal Reserve And Trust Fund; To Provide That All Proceeds Received By The City As A Result Of The Termination Of Lease And For The Sale Of The Real And Personal Property Related To The Baptist Memorial Hospital-north Mississippi Facilities Located On Lamar Avenue Shall Be Deposited Into The Fund; To Provide For The Establishment Of The Board Of Trustees Of The City Of Oxford Municipal Reserve And Trust Fund And Provide For The Appointment Of Its Members; To Provide For The Powers And Duties Of The Board Of Trustees; To Provide For The Investment Of The Assets Of The Trust Fund; To Provide That The Fund Shall Be Divided Into A Corpus Component And An Earning Component; To Provide That The Corpus Component Shall Remain Inviolate Except As Otherwise Provided In This Act; To Provide That The Earnings Component Shall Be Transferred From The Trust Fund To The General Fund Of The City And Shall Be Available For Appropriation And Spending By The Governing Authorities Of The City; To Authorize Money From The Corpus Of The Trust To Be Expended By The City Under Certain Circumstances; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Oxford; establish the City of Oxford Municipal Reserve and Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-28 | Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-24 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2011-03-23 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-23 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-23 | Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-18 | Referred To Local and Private |