MS SC509 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Dedicated Public Service And Business Legacy Of Former Hattiesburg Mayor And Mississippi Icon Bobby Lee Chain.
Title
Commend life and public service of former Hattiesburg Mayor and Mississippi Icon Bobby Lee Chain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-01-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-01-14 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |