MS SC527 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Remembering The Legacy Of Jackson State University Legend Walter Payton On The Occasion Of His Designation As No. 16 In Espn's College Football's 150 Greatest Players.
Title
Remember JSU Legend Walter Payton on the occasion of being named as No. 16 in ESPN's College Football's 150 Greatest Players.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Rules |