MS SC545 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Title Suff Do Be Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Title Suff Do Be Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Congratulating Jessica Banahan Mcneel, Representing The Pascagoula-gautier School District, As The "2024 Mississippi Parent Of The Year."
Title
Recognize Jessica Banahan NcNeel as MDE "2024 Mississippi Parent of the Year."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |